judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00039-CV
14-82-00039-CV
01/20/1982
Automobile Personal Injury
World Wide Tire Company
Brown, Almond Charles
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1983Mandate Issued
06/22/1983Higher Court Decision
01/31/1983No description available.
01/13/1983Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
12/22/1982Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
12/09/1982Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
12/09/1982Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
12/09/1982Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
09/16/1982Submitted
08/30/1982No description available.
08/19/1982Submission
03/25/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
03/18/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/05/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/25/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
02/25/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/09/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/20/1982Transcript FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
78-10