judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REMARK VS. LAFLIN

Case Information: 38318
Short Caption:REMARK VS. LAFLINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38259
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D127249Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Becker, LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice BeckerPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/15/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/15/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lynn R. Shoen--check no. 4176.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13894
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14445
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
10/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Mary P. Laflin hereby substitutes Bruce I. Shapiro as attorney of record in the place and stead of Israel L. Kunin. 01-16667
10/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
10/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Substitution of Attorneys. 01-16969
11/06/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18553
02/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 6, 2001, the settlement judge filed a status report indicating that the parties agreed to a settlement. To date the parties have failed to file a motion for remand or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a motion to remand, along with a copy of an order of the district court certifying that it is inclined to grant the parties' requested relief. If appellant is unable to obtain Huneycutt certification, appellant shall so inform this court in writing within the same time period. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 02-02695
02/28/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand. 02-03743
03/06/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand. 02-04104
03/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On March 6, 2002, appellant filed a motion to dismiss this appeal and remand this matter to the district court for entry of a judgment consistent with the settlement reached by the parties. We grant appellant's motion. "We remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification, and we order this appeal dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP02-WM/MS/RR 02-05375
03/27/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.