judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOIS JUDD v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0095)
Case Number:S-09-0095Case Docketed On:05/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:LOIS JUDD v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:LOIS JUDD, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLois JuddNancy L. Williams
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 85
Citation:233 P.3d 956

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but NOA received without attachmentsNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
05/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/18/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in district courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/01/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/21/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/04/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record; Volume IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order - reversing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2010Motion - Fees and costs and AffidavitMotionFees and costsFinal
07/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Affidavit (Statement of Attorney's Fees and Costs)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2010Response/Objection - Motion - for fees and costs.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to motion for payment of attorney's feesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/4/10ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal