judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHELLE EATMON V. IAP WORLDWIDE SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0027
Short Caption:MICHELLE EATMON V. IAP WORLDWIDE SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00800-10Filed Date:01/19/2011

Opening Event Date:01/19/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMichelle Eatmon YPro SeN
RespondentIap Worldwide ServicesNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/19/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW-NUNC PRO TUNC
01/19/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
01/28/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT to JANUARY 19, 2011. It is *****MORE*****
01/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for haivng been UNTIMELY FILED...OR as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
01/28/2011TMC - OTSC
03/03/2011 ORDERED that this PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13 (a). (FIKGST) (rm)
03/03/2011DISMISSED
03/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED
05/09/2011MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE Denied
05/09/2011RECEIVED - petitoner's motion to reinstate
05/10/2011TMC - motion to reinstate - motion to recall mandate
06/01/2011ORD DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE (FIKGST)