judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WEST END CITIZENS ASSOCIATION V. D.C. BD. OF ZONING ADJUSTMENT

Case Information: 11-AA-0039
Short Caption:WEST END CITIZENS ASSOCIATION V. D.C. BD. OF ZONING ADJUSTMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Of Zoning Adjustment (BZA)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BZA18031-AFiled Date:01/19/2011

Opening Event Date:01/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:06/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/06/2015

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorFoggy Bottom Grocery LLCN
Constance J. Miller YN
PetitionerWest End Citizens Association IncorporatedN
Martin P. SullivanYY
RespondentD.C. Office of ZoningN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/19/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
01/19/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
01/19/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
02/03/2011NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE of Fogg Bottom Grocery, LLC
02/09/2011FiledRECORD ON APPEAL
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/15/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/28/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/28/2011APPENDIX
04/25/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 14 days
04/26/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
05/10/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 21 days
05/19/2011RECEIVED - BZA statement in lieu.
06/01/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the lodged statemetn in lieu of brief is filed. (JAC)
06/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/21/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
06/22/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/14/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner)
07/25/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Intervenor)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/29/2011FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Farrell
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/30/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Petitioner)Granted
09/24/2012FiledOrdered that respondent, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
10/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to responde to court's order 9/24/12 Opposition/Reply/Answer (Respondent)Granted
10/09/2012LodgedAnswer/Response to petitioner's petition for rehearing. (Intervenor)
10/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting repondent's motion for an extension of time to file a response to petitioner's petition to November 8, 2012.
10/18/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File to respond to court's order Other (Intervenor)Granted
10/22/2012FiledOrdered that the intervenor's motion for leave is granted, and the Clerk shall file the intervenor's response to petitioner's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. F/O that respondent's response to petitioner's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc remain due on or before November 8, 2012.
11/06/2012FiledAnswer/Response to petitioner's petition for rehearing (Respondent)
12/19/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Remanding Record
12/16/2014FiledSupplemental Record (Folders 1 and 2 - Augmented Record)
01/28/2015FiledLetter From Intervenor's counsel regarding the December 8, 2014 remand decision from D.C. Board of Zoning and Adjustment (order attached) (Intervenor)
02/10/2015FiledPetitioner's position on BZA remand order on Estoppel issue (Petitioner)
04/02/2015FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and McLeese, Associate Judges; and Farrell, Senior Judge)
05/06/2015FiledMandate