judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHATLEY (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38319
Short Caption:WHATLEY (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010474Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13900
08/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: March 15, 2001, July 12, 2001. Court Reporter: D. Vieira. Filed in district court on: August 13, 2001. 01-13932
08/29/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 15, 2001 and July 12, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. 01-14660
09/24/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16047
09/24/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-16048
10/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16964
10/09/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Seal or Redact the Rough Draft Transcript. 01-16965
11/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn2[On October 9, 2001, the State filed a motion to seal or redact portions of the rough draft transcript of the sentencing hearing, held on July 12, 2001. Because a motion to seal district court transcripts should be filed in the district court, we deny the motion without prejudice.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-19068
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19657
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19657