judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRY E. NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0096)
Case Number:S-09-0096Case Docketed On:05/14/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:TERRY E. NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TERRY E. NEIDLINGER, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry Earl Neidlinger Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Jurisdiction - Subject Matter
Opinion Number:2010 WY 54
Citation:230 P.3d 306

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/14/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/01/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/18/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/26/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five total volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Original Supreme Court Record 06-292 & S-07-0062 (containing three volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/27/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/13/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/13/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/17/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal