judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00708-CR
14-89-00708-CR
07/28/1989
All Misdemeanors
Smith, Andrew Joseph
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1990Case stored
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAMOOT
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/21/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/20/1989Submitted
12/20/1989Submission
12/20/1989Submitted
12/15/1989Order Entered
12/05/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
11/10/1989Order Entered
11/10/1989Order Entered
11/06/1989Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
11/06/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1989No description available.
10/30/1989No Statement of Facts FILED
09/26/1989No description available.
09/22/1989Transcript FILED
07/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1989Date of Sentence
07/26/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasMarshall A. Shelsy
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Rokki Ford Roberts
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 2
Harris
891,3115
$500 fine/10 days