judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1084-89
PD-1084-89
07/28/1989
PDR Case Type
GANT, RUSSELL LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/29/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gant, Russell LeeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Roy E. Greenwood
STATE OF TEXASStateDavid P. Weeks
David Barron
Court of Appeals Information:
10-87-00176-CR
Aff 6-15-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Madison
Honorable ERWIN G. ERNST
8168