judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00704-CR
14-89-00704-CR
07/28/1989
Other Drug Possession
Coleman, Anthony James
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1990Case stored
08/14/1990Mandate Issued
08/14/1990Mandate Issued
08/01/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDDISMISSED
07/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/18/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/01/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
03/12/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/12/1990Case ready to be set
03/12/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/20/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/22/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/26/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/25/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/22/1989Transcript FILED
07/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/25/1989Date of Sentence
07/25/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTom Moran
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantStanley G. Schneider
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD K. SHIPLEY
508,826
5 years prob., $500 fine