judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BYRON G. KOLLENBORN v. KAY KOLLENBORN

Case: A-4678
A-4678
05/12/1954
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
BYRON G. KOLLENBORN
KAY KOLLENBORN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
06/02/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/02/1954Brief on the MeritsRelator
06/01/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/12/1954Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
05/12/1954Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedRelator
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
07/08/1954Order from Lower Court filed
06/10/1954Letter Filed
06/09/1954Opinion issued
06/02/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/02/1954Brief on the Merits
06/01/1954Response to Petition
05/24/1954Submission reset
05/21/1954Miscellaneous Motion
05/21/1954Affidavit filed
05/21/1954Order from Lower Court filed
05/12/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/12/1954Order from Lower Court filed
05/12/1954Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
05/12/1954motion for leave to file petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kay KollenbornRespondent
Byron G. KollenbornRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information