judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QUINEY (DWAYNE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34922
Short Caption:QUINEY (DWAYNE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148833Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09524
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11147
02/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/15/00. 00-02534
02/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-00688
02/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00766
02/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2001. 01-00766