judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0006
Short Caption:RONALD JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 10-CF-1013 Consolidated:11-CF-0006
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-11977-08Filed Date:01/04/2011

Opening Event Date:01/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/15/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Johnson Y
Craig N. MooreYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Suzanne C. NylandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/24/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1013 and 11-CF-6 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Craig Moore, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Ronald Johnson in appeal no. 11-CF-6. F/O that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-6 shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcript necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. F/O that the brief and limited appendix of appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1013 remain due on or before March 1, 2011. (JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1013)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1013)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (SEALED pleading)
02/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (JOHNSON) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (8 pgs/Rogers) 5/25/10 proc.
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (13 pgs/Rogers) 5/26/10 proc.
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (18 pgs/tape) 12/14/10 proc. w/cd
03/15/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 27, 2011 (unopposed)
03/22/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-6)
03/22/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CF-6)
03/22/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (Sealed documnents)
03/29/2011 On consideration of appellant Sheldon Hargrove's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, and it appering that the complete record on appeal has been filed in appeal no. 11-CF-6, it is ORDERED that appellant Hargrove's motion is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 27, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Ronald Johnson's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 29, 2011, granting appellant Sheldon Hargrove's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before April 27, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant Hargrove shall, w/in 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time w/in which to do so. (Castillo)
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Johnson) no oppo
05/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo (Hargrove) to 30 days
06/01/2011 On consideration of appellant Ronald Johnson's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix, and the unopposed motion of appellant Sheldon Hargrove for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion of Johnson is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 8, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Hargrove is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 11, 2011. (Castillo)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 10 days (unopposed)(Hargrove)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed) (Hargrove)
07/01/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief w/Appendix attached (Hargrove)
08/04/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant Hargrove's Motions for extension of time to file the brief & for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix.
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief by 30 days (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Johnson's motion for extension to 9/7/11.
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (30 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/cd
09/07/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file appellant's brief and limited appendix.
09/13/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extension to 11/17/11.
11/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/01/2011FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/02/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF/MOTION TO FILE (lodged) BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES
12/14/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTIONS AND THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED BRIEF FO APPELLEE...
12/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/17/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Hargrove's counsel) (Appellant)Granted
03/01/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Hargrove's counsel) (Appellant) advise w/n 30 days.
03/29/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/11/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Granted
04/17/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt Hargrove's motion to continue oral argument.
06/01/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/23/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief. (Hargrove)
10/23/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/31/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Fisher, Farrell Ian A. Williams, Esq. for appellant Craig N. Moore, Esq. for appellant Suzanne C. Nyland, Esq. for appellee
11/01/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Chief Judge Washington, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge)
12/10/2012FiledMandate