judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS VS. SCHRADER

Case Information: 34921
Short Caption:THOMAS VS. SCHRADERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34745
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A320120Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/08/1999 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pico & Mitchell--check no. 014029.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09527
10/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11743
12/03/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. July 6 to July 26, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Associated Court Reporters. 99-12098
12/16/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and 100 days to file the opening brief and appendix.Court reporter Janice Liston shall have 30 days to prepare and file with this court a certified copy of the transcript; Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-12711
01/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-00239
01/14/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from court reporter Janice R. Liston regarding transcripts. Requesting an extension of 30 days to complete the transcript. 00-00637
01/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Janice R. Liston shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcripts requested in this matter. 00-00898
01/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 07/06/99 through 07/09/99; 07/13/99 through 07/16/99; 07/19/99 through 07/22/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Janice R. Liston. 00-01512
02/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (transcripts) 00-02341
04/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall within 10 days of the date of this order inform this court whether all requested transcripts have been filed. 00-05573
05/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, inform this court in writing whether all requested transcripts have been filed and file and serve the opening brief and appendix or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening biref, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this order may result in immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-07721
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have not complied with this court's orders of December 16, 1999, and May 10, 2000, or otherwise communicated with this court. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17315
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17440
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17440