judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-11-0047)
Case Number:S-11-0047Case Docketed On:02/28/2011
Linked To: S-11-0048
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantExxon Mobil CorporationPatrick Reed Day
Lawrence J. Wolfe
Brent R. Kunz
AppelleeDepartment of RevenueMichael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2011 WY 161
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/28/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/28/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
03/03/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk for additional pleadings, she will send.EventPhone CallFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Supporting documents to 12.09(b) CertificationNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Returned check to Holland & Hart for docket fee sent when Petition was filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
03/14/2011Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
05/02/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs - Exxon Mobil Corporation.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Exxon Mobile CorporationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Exxon Mobile Corporation's statement of cost of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee (Respondent) Wyoming Department of RevenueEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin L. Hardsocg for Wyoming Department of Revenue.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick R. Day for Exxon Mobil Corporation.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/08/2011Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Cranfill assigned to act in this matter and recusing Chief Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/08/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Exxon Mobil CorporationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record Volumes 1 - 41.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt, Burke, and DJ Cranfill (Patrick Reed Day, Brent R. Kunz and Lawrence J. Wolfe, argument by Mr. Day for Exxon Mobil Corporation; Martin L. Hardsocg, Senior Assistant Attorney General for Department of Revenue) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, District Judge Cranfill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2011Record - Record returned to district court (one volume, original papers only) (forty-one volumes, agency record, to be picked up by the State Board of Equalization).RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/03/2012Service - Other - Receipt of record signed for by State Board of Equalization (41 volumes) agency record.ServiceOtherFinal
01/05/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/3/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal