judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN DUDLEY V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Information: 11-AA-0004
Short Caption:ALLEN DUDLEY V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Not SpecifiedFiled Date:01/07/2011

Opening Event Date:01/07/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAllen Dudley Y
Marc BorbelyNY
RespondentD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/07/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW - NUNC PRO TUNC
01/07/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
01/14/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE LODGED PFR, NPT, to JANUARY 7, 2011. It is ****MORE*****
01/14/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction since the Final Decision does not appear to be from a contested case since the decision indicates that it is not precedent setting... (BY: ETW)
01/14/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - ROTSC (RESPONDENT) - reply
02/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
02/16/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE SHALL FILE A REPLY to appellant's response to the show cause order w/n 10 days from the date of this order. (FIBEFA) (cb)
03/01/2011RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file response to 3/7/11 no oppo
03/02/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and RESPONDNDENT'S REPLY to petitioner's response to the OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN MARCH 7, 2011. (BY: CASTILLO) LW
03/07/2011RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petitoner's response to show cause order
03/10/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY to respondent's response to show cause order
03/16/2011 ORDERED that this PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED since the informal hearing final decision did not arise from a contested case and therefore this court lacks jurisdiction over the matter...SEE HARDCOPY (FIBEFA) (cb)
03/16/2011DISMISSED
03/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED