judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8899
C-8899
07/28/1989
U.S. Certified Question accepted by Supreme Court
HUMANA HOSPITAL CORPORATION INC.
AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/02/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedAppellee in caseRESPONSE TO APPELLANT'S MO RE.
03/15/1990Motion for RehearingAppellant in case
11/28/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF MOTOR VEHICLE MANUFACTURERS ASSOC OF THE U.S., INC., ATTY-JEFFREY R SECKEL, 4300 NCNB PLAZA, POB 50100 DALLAS TX
11/27/1989Appellees' Brief filedAppellee in caseAPPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/10/1989Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAPPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/28/1989Brief on the MeritsAppellee in case
07/28/1989Brief on the MeritsAppellant in case
07/28/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellant in caseA RULE 28(J) LETTER FILED ON SEPT.6 1988 IN FIFTH COURT OF APPEALS FR/APPELLANT'S ATTORNEY
07/28/1989Exhibits in case/cause filed'RECORD ON APPEAL' (5 VOLUMES)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/30/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsORIGINAL RECORD FROM THE FEDERAL COURT RETURNED 785 SW2D 144
04/04/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
04/02/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRESPONSE TO APPELLANT'S MO RE.
03/26/1990Notice requesting filing fee
03/16/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
03/15/1990Motion for Rehearing
03/14/1990Notice requesting filing fee
03/05/1990cover ltr with jmt
02/28/1990Opinion issuedCertified question answered by the CourtOP/J.MAUZY 785 SW2D 144
11/29/1989Oral argument ARGUED FOR APPELLANT BY CATHEY J. SHEEHAN ARGUED FOR RESP BY JOHN MILANO, JR.
11/28/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF MOTOR VEHICLE MANUFACTURERS ASSOC OF THE U.S., INC., ATTY-JEFFREY R SECKEL, 4300 NCNB PLAZA, POB 50100 DALLAS TX
11/27/1989Appellees' Brief filedAPPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/10/1989Brief on the MeritsAPPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/11/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20-10 MINUTES.
10/11/1989Certified Question disposedCertified Question acceptedQUESTION IN 5TH CIRCUIT OPINION
10/11/1989Oral argument Filing granted
08/15/1989Cost letter issued
07/28/1989Brief on the Merits
07/28/1989Brief on the Merits
07/28/1989Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals filedQUESTION IS IN 5TH CIRCUIT OPINION
07/28/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedA RULE 28(J) LETTER FILED ON SEPT.6 1988 IN FIFTH COURT OF APPEALS FR/APPELLANT'S ATTORNEY
07/28/1989Exhibits in case/cause filed'RECORD ON APPEAL' (5 VOLUMES)
07/28/1989No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/30/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SMITH, ANDREW C.AppellantMr. Richard N. Francis Jr.
AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.AppelleeMr. John Milano Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information