judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-09793-CV
06-89-09793-CV
07/28/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Chapin, Jeffrey Mack
The Hon. Joe R. Pogue, Judge, County Court of Hopkins County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/12/1989Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/16/1989
08/01/1989
07/28/1989Motion for leave to file
07/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information