judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00913-CV
05-89-00913-CV
07/28/1989
Probate
Ronald Dee Beck, Ind. & as Independent Executor of the esta
Lilliam M. Beck
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/2018Order enteredDestroy
09/08/2017Letter issued by the court
10/15/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/07/1991Mandate Issued
10/07/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/07/1991Mandate Issued
08/24/1990Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1990MattConv
07/27/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/09/1990Response to Motion
06/29/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/29/1990Submitted
05/29/1990Submission
05/29/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/27/1990Submission
03/26/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Motion for Postponement
02/22/1990MattConv
01/23/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
12/27/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
12/13/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
12/08/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Response to Motion
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
10/05/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
09/21/1989Case ready to be set
09/21/1989Brief Filed
09/21/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/01/1989Letter Filed
08/31/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
08/29/1989Brief Filed
08/29/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/17/1989MattConv
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
07/28/1989Transcript Filed
07/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/05/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/07/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
336th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Ray Felty Grisham
89-1002