judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8921
C-8921
08/02/1989
App Writ of Error
LOUISIANA & ARKANSAS RAILWAY COMPANY
MELVIN BLAKELY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/14/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/16/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/02/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/28/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
06/27/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
06/14/1990Motion for Rehearing
06/14/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
05/30/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/16/1989Reply to Response
08/02/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/28/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
773 SW2d 595, 05-02-89
6th Court of Appeals
Honorable CHARLES BLEIL
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
Honorable Robert B. Baum
87-0053