judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00732-CR
14-89-00732-CR
08/02/1989
Assault & battery
Richardson, Elzia Allen
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1990Case stored
11/14/1990Mandate Issued
11/14/1990Mandate Issued
10/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
07/25/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/11/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
03/27/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/05/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/30/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
11/21/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
09/28/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
09/21/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
09/21/1989Transcript FILED
08/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/25/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SE
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRandy McDonald
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable PUTNAM REITER
521,532