judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00929-CR
05-89-00929-CR
08/02/1989
Robbery
Davis, Leslie James
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/2000Record RetentionRetain
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/26/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/25/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/02/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/18/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/18/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/18/1990Motion for Postponement
03/12/1990MattConv
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/08/1989Brief Filed
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/14/1989Transcript Filed
08/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
07/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F89-72116-LU
30 yrs TDC