judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION v. BEN FISH

Case: A-4688
A-4688
05/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
BEN FISH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/31/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/31/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1954Letter Filed
06/21/1954Response to Motion filed
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1954Reply to Response
05/31/1954Brief in Support of Petition
05/27/1954Response to Petition
05/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Ben FishRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information