judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH NATHANIEL CLEVELAND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0044
Short Caption:JOSEPH NATHANIEL CLEVELAND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD19583-10Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Nathaniel Cleveland YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Walter S. Booth, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/27/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Walter Booth, Esquire
02/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape (Morning) 1/13/11 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (33pgs/Tape (Afternoon) 1/13/11 proc.
02/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/25/2011RECORD INDEX
02/25/2011RECORD COPIES
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (unopposed)
03/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/19/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/19/2011APPENDIX
06/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/23/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance-MOTION TO FILE (lodged) OPPO
06/27/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to 30 days. no oppo
07/01/2011FiledOrder Granting MOET and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN AUGUST 4, 2011
08/04/2011FiledOpposition to motion for sumaary affirmance (Appellant)
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/28/2011FiledAffirmed
10/03/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/24/2011FiledMandate