judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JORY VS. STATE

Case Information: 34916
Short Caption:JORY VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C160867Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09480
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 15 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10881
11/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 11/15/99. 99-11449
11/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04241
04/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05804
04/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2000. 00-05804