judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY DAVID KRAMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0043)
Case Number:S-11-0043Case Docketed On:02/22/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - General Provisions 6-1-101 - 6-1-304
Short Title:TIMOTHY DAVID KRAMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY DAVID KRAMER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy David KramerDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingD. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Justin A. Daraie
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2012 WY 69
Citation:277 P.3d 88

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/22/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/22/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/07/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief with Affidavit attachedMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/26/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/26/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel and stay in the proceedings; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/21/2011Order - Remand - CaleneOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
09/26/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion, transcript for remand hearingRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/28/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law after remand pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 21Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Resuming briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingResuming briefing scheduleFinal
11/15/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Timothy D. Kramer; and received copy of designation of the record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Justin Daraie obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/30/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV - V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Folder; Volume VII, Exhibits; Volume VIII, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Donna D. Domonkos obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna Domonkos for appellant; Justin Daraie for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/17/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/04/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/20/2012Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for writ of certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
10/18/2012Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari is denied.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal