judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00727-CR
14-89-00727-CR
08/02/1989
Other Drug Sale or Delivery
Gamboa, Feliciano
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1989Case stored
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
11/30/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/30/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/29/1989Submitted
11/29/1989Submission
11/29/1989Submitted
11/21/1989Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
11/09/1989Order Entered
09/26/1989No description available.
09/25/1989Transcript FILED
08/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/31/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/27/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. William E. Satterwhite
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
480,853
6 years TDC