judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00204-CR
02-89-00204-CR
08/02/1989
Burglary
Lee, III, James
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/08/1991Mandate Issued
02/12/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/18/1990Brief Filed
06/18/1990Case ready to be set
03/20/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/16/1990Letter of Inquiry Response
02/06/1990Brief Filed
02/06/1990Letter
02/02/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/03/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/06/1989Brief Filed
11/01/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/28/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
08/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lee, III, JamesCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0361210D
50 yrs., TDC