judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD LEWIS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-1633
Short Caption:RONALD LEWIS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8863-08Filed Date:12/29/2010

Opening Event Date:12/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/19/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Lewis N
Susan L. KrugerNY
Alan LeschtNY
Rani RolstonYY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.YY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 29, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been order and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (13-pgs/tape 9/21/10 proc.)w/cd
01/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 9/21/10) (elp)
01/31/2011RECORD INDEX
01/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/15/2011APPENDIX
04/19/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/19/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Thompson, Farrell
12/19/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
01/10/2012FiledMandate