judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN KEVIN ECKDAHL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0042)
Case Number:S-11-0042Case Docketed On:02/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JOHN KEVIN ECKDAHL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN KEVIN ECKDAHL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn Kevin Eckdahl Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 152
Citation:264 P.3d 22

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/04/2011Motion - Appointment of counsel and Extension of Time (Certificate of service date 02/25/2011, Prisoner delivery stamp dated 02/28/2011, postmark 03/01/2011)MotionAppointment of counselFinal
03/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Prisoner's Application In Forma Pauperis (Same mail service as above)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/22/2011Order - Grant - extension of time and Order Denying Motion for Appointment of CounselOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/04/2011Correspondence - Incoming - received request from appellant for legal materials.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/04/2011Correspondence - Outgoing - sent copy of W.R.A.P. Rule 7 to appellant.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
04/25/2011Brief - Appellant (No certificate of service attached. Brief is dated 04/04/2011 and 04/18/2011 and was mailed on 04/19/2011 "Parcel Post Economy. Called AG, if copy not received today or tomorrow, will make copy)BriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/20/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief (reply)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2011Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
06/24/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/15/2011Event - Phone Call - Called the district court clerk regarding record. They sent it UPS ground Monday. She will be calling back after checking the tracking information.EventPhone CallFinal
07/15/2011Event - Phone Call - Clerk's office called. Package is on truck and is supposed to be delivered today.EventPhone CallFinal
07/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/15/2011Event - Other - Appellant requested copy of docket page, copy mailedEventOtherFinal
11/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing for lack of jurisdiction, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/05/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/01/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal