judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONTRACTORS BONDING VS. CORONA C/W 35123

Case Information: 34915
Short Caption:CONTRACTORS BONDING VS. CORONA C/W 35123Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34915*, 35123 Related Case(s): 35123
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A351642Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/15/1999 / Barker, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bell and Young, Ltd.--check no. 13638.
10/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09479
10/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Barker. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 8, 1999. 99-11601
12/10/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Continuance of Settlement Conference. 99-12453
12/20/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Determination as to Whether or Not Rule 54(b) Certification is Final and Appealable. 99-12912
12/27/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response in opposition to motion for Determination. 99-13145
02/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. On November 15, 1999, this court issued notices in Docket No. 35123 giving appellant ten days to pay the filing fee and to file the case appeal statement. Because the filing fee has been paid and the case appeal statement filed in Docket No. 34915, we vacate the November 15, 1999 notices issued in Docket No. 35123. Nos. 34915, 35123. 00-02935
04/24/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. (Nos. 34915 and 35123). 00-06555
05/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . these consolidated appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[We deny as moot appellant's motion filed on December 20, 1999, in docket Number 34915.] SNP/CLK Nos. 34915, 35123. 00-07514
05/08/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.