judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00731-CR
14-89-00731-CR
08/02/1989
All Misdemeanors
Rogers, Jr., James Murel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/1989Case stored
11/03/1989Mandate Issued
11/03/1989Mandate Issued
10/19/1989Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
09/20/1989Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
09/20/1989Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/08/1989Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/25/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/09/1989Submitted
08/09/1989Submission
08/09/1989Submitted
08/02/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/02/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/02/1989Case ready to be set
08/02/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/02/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
08/02/1989Case ready to be set
08/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/15/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRokki Ford Roberts
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 7
Harris
4563
$750 fine