judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-82-00009-CR
04-82-00009-CR
01/13/1982
Other Drug Possession
Curren, Cecil Ruben
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
07/01/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/15/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/20/1982Submission
10/20/1982Submitted
10/18/1982Submission
04/15/1982Record Filed
04/13/1982Record Approved
01/13/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
01/13/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Tom Rickhoff
81-CR-2784A
Seven Years