judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS VS. ELDORADO HOTEL

Case Information: 38300
Short Caption:THOMAS VS. ELDORADO HOTELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9904727Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/2001 / Frey, NicholasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due. 04/09/02 Order Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. We waive the filing fee, clerk's fees and appeal bond.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13679
08/16/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nicholas F. Frey. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14916
09/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nicholas F. Frey.
09/12/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-15463
09/12/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions. 01-15471
09/12/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. 01-15472
09/25/2001MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and "Response to Docketing Statement". 01-16192
10/04/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and "Response to Docketing Statement". 01-16755
12/05/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Recommendation of Settlement Judge. 01-20416
12/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program pending a decision on respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal for jurisdiction. If this court determines that jurisdiction is proper, settlement conference proceedings pursuant to NRAP 16 shall resume. 01-21349
04/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Proceed In forma Pauperis filed September 12, 2001. We waive the filing fee, clerk's fees and appeal bond. 02-06259
07/24/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Changed "Eldorado Resorts, Ltd." to "Eldorado Resorts, LLC."
07/29/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Miranda Du in response to notice of modification of caption. The respondent in this case is Eldorado Resorts LLC d/b/a Eldorado Hotel and Casino. 02-12962
08/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Temporary Remand. Order of Limited Remand and Denying Motion to Strike. The question before us is whether a late notice of appeal was nevertheless timely because appellant allegedly was not served with written notice of the order's entry. Because resolving this jurisdictional issue requires a factual finding, we remand this matter to the district court for proceedings and findings limited to resolving the factual question before us. The district court's findings shall be certified and transmitted to the clerk of this court within 60 days of the date of this order. Appellant filed a motion to strike the response to the docketing statement and the motion to dismiss, arguing that they were both untimely. We deny appellant's motion to strike.The briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 02-14513
10/16/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on October 14, 2002. 02-17974
11/08/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Firm Name Change - McDonald firm. 02-19332
11/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal on the basis that the notice of appeal was not timely filed. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP03Y-WM/RR/DA 02-19365
12/10/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19663
12/10/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 16, 2002. 02-19663