judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VINCENT ROSTY v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ

Case Heading (S-11-0063)
Parent:S-11-0063Case Docketed On:03/21/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0136
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:VINCENT ROSTY v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ
Full Title:VINCENT ROSTY, Appellant (Defendant), v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVincent RostyHampton K. O'Neill
Timothy M. Stubson
AppelleeShari SkajTimothy W. Miller
Robert Todd Ingram
AppelleeSteve SkajTimothy W. Miller
Robert Todd Ingram

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate
Opinion Number:2012 WY 28
Citation:272 P.3d 947

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/18/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hard copies received. Phone Call to counsel for Appellant requesting original copy of Motion.EventPhone CallFinal
04/20/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/29/2011Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk, she received order from Federal District Court removing case to that court, e-mailed order.EventPhone CallFinal
05/03/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellee regarding filing of motion to dismiss second notice of appeal. Explained that case has not yet been docketed. Counsel also indicated that the order removing to federal court does not affect appeal issues and case will not be dismissed.EventPhone CallFinal
06/03/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to ConsolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2011Response/Objection - Motion to consolidate.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Opposition to Motion to ConsolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Order - Denying, Without Prejudice, Motion to Dismiss and Order Granting Motion to ConsolidateOrderDenyFinal
07/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Response BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court clerkNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy M. Stubson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Todd Ingram for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Timothy M. Stubson for appellant; Robert Todd Ingram for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of addressNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Change of Address for Counsel for Appellant Vincent RostyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/08/2012Event - Phone Call - Send copy of mandate to Federal District Court in CasperEventPhone CallFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/19/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/15/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal