judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEUART INVESTMENT COMPANY V. MEYER GROUP, LTD

Case Information: 11-CV-0020
Short Caption:STEUART INVESTMENT COMPANY V. MEYER GROUP, LTDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:11-CV-0020Consolidated: 11-CV-0346
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8449-08Filed Date:01/06/2011

Opening Event Date:01/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeSteuart Investment CompanyN
T. Michael GuiffreYY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantMeyer Group LtdN
Michael K. RossYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
02/17/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 1/28/11
02/28/2011 ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) LW
02/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/10-11/10) (elp)
03/09/2011RECORD INDEX - (11-CV-20)
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (376-pgs/OTT 5/10-11/10 proc.)w/cd
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal in these matters, and this court's briefing order of March 17, 2011, issued in appeal no. 11-CV-20, and it appearing that no new transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-346, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this court's order of March 17, 2011, is hereby vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-20 and 11-CV-346 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index for 11-CV-346 forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appelant, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross- appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (ETW) elp
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv346
05/16/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/23/11
05/23/2011RECEIVED - Appellant/Cross-Appellee Brief and Appendix Vols 1 thru 3
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant/cross- appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief of appellant/cross-appellee and the appendixes Volumes 1-3. It is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant/cross-appellee and appendixes Volume 1-3 are filed. It is (MORE)
06/02/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/02/2011APPENDIX - (Volumes 1-3)
06/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee/ cross appellant shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/27/2011APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/17/2011FiledReply Brief cross aplt (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/07/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Reid
03/07/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
04/01/2013FiledMandate