judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-82-00014-CV
08-82-00014-CV
01/13/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Herring, Herman
Hathcock, W. G. 'Dub' et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
02/10/1983Mandate Issued
12/22/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/20/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
12/09/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/16/1982Submitted
06/02/1982Submission
03/12/1982Brief Filed
02/23/1982Brief Filed
02/03/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/03/1982Record filed.
01/13/1982No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
109th District Court
Andrews
7698