judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00081-CR
14-82-00081-CR
01/17/1982
Robbery
George, Michael Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
06/28/1983No description available.
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/05/1983Submission
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
01/31/1983No description available.
11/22/1982No description available.
09/28/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/01/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/17/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/08/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Chambers
3947
10 yrs.