judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00022-CR
14-82-00022-CR
01/17/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Fransaw, Clifton
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/30/1984Mandate Issued
05/25/1984No description available.
12/16/1983Record RETURNED from Higher Court
11/04/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
08/23/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/11/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/04/1983Submission
04/18/1983No description available.
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
01/25/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
12/28/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
12/17/1982No description available.
09/09/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
12/17/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
321,485
Life