judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-82-00013-CV
07-82-00013-CV
01/15/1982
Divorce
Chandler, Richard and Patrick, in the Matter of Termination
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/1984Mandate Issued
07/03/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
03/13/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtDismissed
02/28/1984Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
01/30/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/23/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
223rd District Court
Gray
Honorable Ray D. Anderson
22,353