judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-82-00018-CR
02-82-00018-CR
01/25/1982
Other Felony
Bomar, Herbert Darrell and McDonald II, Orison F.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/22/1983Writ of CertiorariMotion or Writ Denied
12/13/1982Writ of Certiorari
09/15/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedRefused
07/14/1982Motion to Stay MandateMotion or Writ Granted
06/16/1982Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/22/1982Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
04/21/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
78th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Keith Nelson, Judge, 78th District Court
117,895-B