judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-82-00038-CR
04-82-00038-CR
01/26/1982
Assault or Attempted Murder
Wagner, Juan
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/30/1983Mandate Issued
06/30/1983Mandate Issued
05/11/1983Submission
05/11/1983Submitted
05/05/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/05/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/03/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/21/1982Brief Filed
04/21/1982Case ready to be set
04/21/1982Case ready to be set
03/22/1982Brief Filed
02/24/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/22/1982Record Approved
01/22/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1981Record Filed
07/16/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-CR-0741-C
Three (3) years