judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00306-CR
04-81-00306-CR
01/26/1982
Other Drug Sale
Rodriguez, Clemente Moya
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/09/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
07/01/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/15/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
06/15/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
04/12/1983Submission
04/12/1983Case ready to be set
04/12/1983Supplemental Authorities Received
04/12/1983Case ready to be set
04/12/1983Submission
04/12/1983Submitted
02/02/1983Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/1983Motion to Withdraw Opinion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/1983Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
12/23/1982Motion to Withdraw Opinion Filed
12/15/1982Opinion issuedAbated
11/24/1982Submission
01/26/1982Record Filed
01/22/1982Record Approved
09/17/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
09/17/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
80-CR-2466-D
7 Years