judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM SCOTT TIERNAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-11-0058)
Case Number:S-11-0058Case Docketed On:03/07/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:WILLIAM SCOTT TIERNAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:WILLIAM SCOTT TIERNAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam Scott TiernanR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
John Sanford Shumway

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 143
Citation:262 P.3d 561 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/19/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of William TiernanEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellant)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/27/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/30/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/02/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal