judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH M. EVANS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0015
Short Caption:JOSEPH M. EVANS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-5414-08Filed Date:01/06/2011

Opening Event Date:01/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/2013
Argued/Submitted:02/27/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/14/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph M. Evans Y
Jenifer WicksYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Katherine M. KellyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
02/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (80 pgs/Ronan) 4/17/09 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 5/22/09 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4 pgs/tape) 1/22/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (57 pgs/Maar) 1/25/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (58-217 pgs/Maar) 1/26/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (218-385 pgs/Maar) 1/27/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (386-507 pgs/Maar) 1/28/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (4 pgs/tape) 4/28/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (16 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 10/15/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (29 pgs/Rogers) 12/10/10 proc. w/cd
03/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/13/2011RECORD COPIES
04/13/2011RECORD INDEX
05/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until the completion of all the transcript (unopposed)
06/08/2011ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days fromt he date of this roder advise this court, with specificity, of what transcript is still outstanding and of all actions appellant has taken, including those taken since the date appellant filed the motion for an extension of time, to assure the transmittal of that transcript to this court. See D.C. App. R. 10. F/O that appellant's motion for an extension of time is hereby held in abeyance pending appellant's response to this order. (ETW)
06/24/2011NOTICE RECEIVED- from aplt pursuant to court
07/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to 12/16/11.
11/09/2011FiledChange Of Address Received Jenifer Wicks (Appellant)
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 6/4/12.
05/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 9/4/12.
09/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/14/12
12/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 3/15/13
03/15/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
04/09/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) no later than 6/3/13.
06/03/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/03/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/02/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/18/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 9/20/13
09/20/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/20/2013FiledBriefing Completed
11/13/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
11/15/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/25/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/26/2013LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/03/2014FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/07/2014FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
02/07/2014FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/20/2014FiledOrder Sua Sponte rescheduling oral argument.
02/20/2014FiledCalendar notice sent
02/27/2014FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Associate Judge Glickman, Judge Edelman Superior Court (Jenifer Wicks, Esq.) (Katherine M. Kelly, Esq.)
03/20/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge; Glickman, Associate Judge; and Edelman, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the District of Columbia)
04/14/2014FiledMandate
06/20/2014FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
09/18/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant-Pro Se)Denied
09/19/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE//AMENDMENT
10/27/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
06/17/2015FiledORDER, SS, DIRECTING the CLERK TO FILE the lodged AMENDMENTS TO the MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and F/O DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE ON the MERITS
06/17/2015FiledAmendment to Pro Se Motion to Recall Mandate (Appellant)
06/17/2015FiledAmendment to the Pro Se Motion to Recall Mandate (Appellant)
04/06/2016FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
06/01/2016FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
08/31/2016FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)