judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES MURRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0672
Short Caption:JAMES MURRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2905-78Filed Date:05/28/1980

Opening Event Date:05/28/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Calvin Steinmetz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURRAY, JAMES AKA JAMES HINES UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
05/28/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/22/1982FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/06/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 7/1/88, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT REQ. COPIES OF MOTIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 2/8/89 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT (PRO SE) IN NATURE OF ERROR CORAM NOBIS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT (PRO SE) ASSIGN- MENT OF ORIGINAL PANEL OF JUDGES & TO RECALL MANDATE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, SUPPLE- MENT MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S MO TO RECALL MAN- DATE & MOTION IN NATURE OF ERROR CORAM NOBIS. MEH PANELFEBESC SCDATE 122289 SCHPRD VS
01/19/1990MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION EN BANC. GW PANELEB SCDATE 013090 SCHPRD VS
07/19/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO RECALL MANDATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RECALL THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE IS DENIED. MEH PANELFEBESC SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD VS
07/31/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990ORDER APLT'S PRO SE PET FOR REHEAR TREATED AS MO FOR LV TO FILE FURT PET FOR REHEAR & DENIED. PANELFEBESC SCDATE 080390 SCHPRD VS
09/19/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO RECALL THE MANDATE (SUPPLEMEN- TAL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991ORDER APLT'S PRO SE SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE IS DENIED. MEH PANELFEBESC SCDATE 100290 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1991MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION EN BANC OF APPELLANT OF MO'S FOR POST JUDGEMENT RELIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1991RECEIVED PRO SE AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR POST JUDGEMENT RELIEF, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 5/9/91 AFFIDAVIT TO DIVISION. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1991ORDER DENY APLT'S REQUEST FOR EN BANC CONSIDERATION (JUDGES TERRY & FARRELL ARE RECUSED)SL PANELEB SCDATE 043091 SCHPRD VS
07/09/1991RECEIVED REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1991RECEIVED MOTION TO REMAND PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1991RECEIVED REQUEST THAT COURT ORDER AND SCHD FULL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR POST JMT RELIEF/APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1991RECEIVED OF APLT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING MO TO RECALL MAN AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1991ORDER APLT'S REQ & MOT RE REMAND & POST-JMT RELIEF ETC DENIED W/O PREJ TO SEEKING RELIEF IN TC. PANELFESCBE SCDATE 071691 SCHPRD VS
08/01/1991MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND RECALL OF ORDER AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND RECALL OF ORDER SL PANELFESCBE SCDATE 081491 SCHPRD VS