judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUSTY LEE MORRIS v. MICHELLE LYNN MORRIS

Case Heading (S-07-0035)
Case Number:S-07-0035Case Docketed On:02/14/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DUSTY LEE MORRIS v. MICHELLE LYNN MORRIS
Full Title:DUSTY LEE MORRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. MICHELLE LYNN MORRIS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDusty Lee MorrisDaNece Day
AppelleeMichelle Lynn MorrisMatthew Ryan Sorenson
Rebecca Lynn Winkler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 174
Citation:170 P.3d 86 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/14/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA attachments were received.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
02/14/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/14/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
02/21/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
03/30/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
03/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Appellant's statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/10/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, confidential folder; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/26/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal