judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. KULKA

Case Information: 34627
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. KULKACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A336147Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/1999 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
08/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mushkin & Hafer--check no. 1401.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07233
08/16/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/07/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Regarding Dale E. Haley, Esq. Address Correction.
10/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10021
11/17/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-11415
12/03/1999Other Other. Received telephone call from office of Mushkin & Hafer. Neither counsel had received copy of November 17, 1999, order. REMAILED November 17, 1999, order to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
02/22/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-02802
02/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." SNP/CLK 00-02914
02/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.