judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5722
B-5722
01/02/1976
Application for Writ of Error
RICHARD W. FORSYTHE
DR. GERALD L. HURST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/23/1976Letter brief Petitioner
03/17/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/23/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/14/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
01/02/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/1976Letter brief
03/17/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1976Reply to Response
01/14/1976Response to Petition
01/02/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Gerald L. HurstRespondent
Richard W. ForsythePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information