judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00088-CR
14-82-00088-CR
01/26/1982
All Misdemeanors
Moore, Horatio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/23/1983Motion to reinstate appeal DISPOSED - APPOVERRULED
06/16/1983No description available.
05/23/1983Mandate Issued
05/03/1983No description available.
03/24/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/04/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/26/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 6
Harris
633,974
90 days & $1000 fine